Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Paramaribo

Dioecesis ParamariboŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname
22 November 1817ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname
12 September 1842ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname Vicariate Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname
Diocese of Paramaribo
7 May 1958ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname Diocese of Paramaribo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname
195029,000180,00016.1%4242690911815ap1951
Diocese of Paramaribo
196666,279330,00020.1%354571,1629820121ap1967
197080,000390,00020.5%351541,481901659ap1971
197670,000350,00020.0%641471,489721128ap1977
198076,000390,00019.5%335382,00016410422ap1981
199087,000392,30022.2%521263,346395629ap1991
1999101,660442,00023.0%514195,350232229ap2000
2000101,660442,00023.0%513185,647202028ap2001
2001100,280436,00023.0%613195,277201831ap2002
2002103,553450,23223.0%715224,706211631ap2003
2003105,635459,28123.0%716234,592201331ap2004
2004110,664481,14623.0%616225,030201131ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013