Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Ferdinandus Zichem, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paramaribo, Suriname


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1933BornParamaribo
8 Sep 195522.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Aug 196027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Oct 196936.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
2 Oct 196936.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
8 Feb 197036.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
30 Aug 197138.5AppointedBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
24 Oct 197138.6InstalledBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
9 Aug 200370.4ResignedBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
13 Nov 201683.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Ferdinandus Zichem (VIAF: 283162432)
Bishop Aloysius Ferdinandus Zichem C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paramaribo

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 18 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016