Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephanus Jozef Maria Magdalena Kuijpers, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paramaribo, Suriname


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1899BornBorkel en Schaft, Netherlands
30 Sep 192021.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Oct 192526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Feb 194646.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
8 Feb 194646.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Termessus
10 Jun 194646.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termessus
7 May 195858.8AppointedBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
24 Aug 195859.1InstalledBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
30 Aug 197172.1RetiredBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
5 Jul 198687.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Jozef Maria Magdalena Kuijpers:
Bishop Stephanus Jozef Maria Magdalena Kuijpers C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paramaribo

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 41
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013