Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andreas Ignatius Schaepman

Deceased

Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1815Born
3 Jul 186044.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
3 Jul 186044.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
26 Aug 186044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Esbus
19 Dec 186247.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
4 Feb 186852.4AppointedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
19 Sep 188267.0DiedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Andreas Ignatius Schaepman (VIAF: 284410413)
Archbishop Andreas Ignatius Schaepman (born , died ) Archbishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZwolle
Ordained BishopSeminary, Chapel, Rijzenburg

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017