Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Filiberto Deppen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

Titular Bishop of Samos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1808BornBuscoducen
15 Nov 185345.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
15 Nov 185345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
2 Apr 185445.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
1 Jun 187769.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Filiberto Deppen:
Bishop Giovanni Filiberto Deppen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013