Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardus Petrus Wilmer

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1800Born
8 Sep 182423.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 186160.4AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
23 Jun 186160.5Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
1 Jan 187776.1DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Gerardus Petrus Wilmer (VIAF: 285105927)
Bishop Gerardus Petrus Wilmer (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoxtel, Vicariate Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)
Ordained BishopBois le Duc Seminary, Haarlem, Diocese of Haarlem

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017