Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henricus van Beek

Deceased

Bishop of Breda, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1816Born
18 Oct 184226.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 187458.2AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
2 Aug 187458.3Ordained BishopBishop of Breda, Netherlands
15 Oct 188468.5DiedBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Henricus van Beek (VIAF: 285845503)
Bishop Henricus van Beek (born , died ) Bishop of Breda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam
Ordained BishopWarmond

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 156
  • ob/c2+: ATh, 26 Oct 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,654
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017