Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Charles Claessens

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia, Indonesia

Titular Archbishop of Siraces


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1818Born
17 Dec 184224.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 187455.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
16 Jun 187455.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
2 Feb 187556.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
4 Jan 188465.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siraces
23 May 1893³74.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
10 Jul 189577.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia, Indonesia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Charles Claessens (VIAF: 281517818)
Bishop Adam Charles Claessens (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSittard, Vicariate Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
Ordained BishopSittard, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 522, and Page 560
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Mar 2017