Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Jakarta

Archidioecesis Giakartana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1973
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 10,775 (4,161 Square Miles)
  • Description: Jakarta Special Province, Tangerang district of Banten province, and Bekasi district of West Java province
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kaj.or.id/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Jl. Katedral 7, Jakarta 10710, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (021)381.33.45; 381.43.22
  • Fax: 385.56.81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Batavia
1826ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Bourbon Prefecture Apostolic of Batavia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Batavia
3 April 1841ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Batavia Vicariate Apostolic of Batavia
4 September 1855Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Labuan e Borneo (erected)
22 December 1902Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese (erected)
11 February 1905Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese} (erected)
30 June 1911Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Sumatra (erected)
16 September 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (erected)
19 November 1919Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of CÚlebes (erected)
27 April 1927Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Malang (erected)
15 February 1928Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Surabaia (erected)
20 April 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia (Priangan and Cheribon) Prefecture Apostolic of Bandung (erected)
25 April 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia (Pekalongan, Banjoemas, and Kedoe (except Tennangseng and Magalang)) Prefecture Apostolic of Purwokerto (erected)
25 June 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia (Central Java (Midden-Java)) Vicariate Apostolic of Semarang (erected)
9 December 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Batavia (Bantang along with Soekaboemi and Tjandoer) Prefecture Apostolic of Sukabumi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Djakarta
7 February 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Vicariate Apostolic of Djakarta
8 November 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Djakarta (Bogor) Prefecture Apostolic of Sukabumi
Archdiocese of Djakarta
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Djakarta Archdiocese of Djakarta
Archdiocese of Jakarta
22 August 1973Name ChangedArchdiocese of Djakarta Archdiocese of Jakarta

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Djakarta
195029,3793,500,000.8%156575155425612ap1951
Archdiocese of Djakarta
197059,8466,500,000.9%892100598133306ap1971
Archdiocese of Jakarta
1980148,0347,545,4212.0%81251331,113121833733ap1981
1990288,05210,233,3002.8%271411681,71426140240ap1991
1998374,77710,579,8003.5%301992291,63640756851ap2002
2002411,03611,279,3323.6%452322771,48339358353ap2004
2013481,65512,751,0003.8%652803451,39646762263ap2014
2016499,48519,090,0002.6%662623281,52243955765ap2017
2019511,89119,795,9502.6%892693581,42949063566ap2020
2021527,99020,202,0202.6%1052763811,38547764167ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Djakarta
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 42, Page 446, and Page 447
  • Archdiocese of Djakarta
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 53, Page 244, to Page 248
  • Archdiocese of Jakarta
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 508, and Page 509

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 11 Nov 2023