Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ende

Archidioecesis Endehena



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paulus Budi Kleden, S.V.D., Archbishop-Elect

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 14 May 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 5,084 (1,963 Square Miles)
  • Description: Bajawa and Ende
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Komplex Misi Ndona, RT 012/RW 007, Kelurahan Onelako, Ndona-Ende 86361, Flores, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0381)21.176
  • Fax: 22.873

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda
16 September 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda
12 March 1922ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda Vicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda
25 May 1936Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (Part of Timor (Dutch), islands of Boti, Savoie, Alor, and Pantar) Vicariate Apostolic of Timor Olandese (erected)
10 July 1950Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (Islands of Bali and Lombok) Prefecture Apostolic of Denpasar (erected)
8 March 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (Manggarai) Vicariate Apostolic of Ruteng (erected)
8 March 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Atambua (Pantar and Alor islands)
Vicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (Larantukan)
Vicariate Apostolic of Larantuka (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Endeh
8 March 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda (Ngada, Ende, and Maumere along with Sumba and Sumbawa islands) Vicariate Apostolic of Endeh
20 October 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Endeh (Islands of Sumba and Sumbawa) Prefecture Apostolic of Weetebula (erected)
Archdiocese of Endeh
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Endeh Archdiocese of Endeh
Archdiocese of Ende
14 May 1974Name ChangedArchdiocese of Endeh Archdiocese of Ende
14 December 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Ende (Eastern Part (Sikka)) Diocese of Maumere (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda
1950440,5364,000,00011.0%11241253,5241909766ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Endeh
Archdiocese of Endeh
1970427,920518,18282.6%131161293,31718922481ap1971
Archdiocese of Ende
1980492,337584,12284.3%251171423,46732024075ap1981
1990576,421586,57598.3%671662332,47331327273ap1991
1997638,043641,24399.5%1131512642,41629735879ap2000
2000660,691662,34399.8%1261783042,17328940279ap2001
2001659,750684,46096.4%1291512802,35623436980ap2002
2002670,932685,88997.8%1441593032,21435636382ap2003
2003683,473709,54796.3%1431743172,15628138082ap2004
2004693,885712,49197.4%1501182682,58924738384ap2005
2005411,334449,05791.6%88761642,5084726952bul13Dec2005
2006416,000454,00091.6%91761672,49119952252ap2007
2013450,000509,00088.4%112811932,33119220158ap2014
2016452,660563,49680.3%117791962,30919919359ap2017
2019471,100584,20080.6%151712222,12219823072ap2020
2021480,760596,18080.6%168712392,01119823072ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 14, Page 224
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Endeh
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 452, and Page 453
  • Archdiocese of Endeh
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 53, Page 244, to Page 248
  • Archdiocese of Ende
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 21 Jun 2024