Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Verstraelen, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Myriophytos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1882Born
24 Feb 190724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Mar 192239.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia
13 Mar 192239.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
1 Oct 192240.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
15 Mar 193249.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Arnold Verstraelen
Bishop Arnold Verstraelen S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevenum, Netherlands

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,922, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast