Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pieter Mathijs Snickers

Deceased

Archbishop of Utrecht


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1816BornRotterdam
1841¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 187761.3AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
2 Sep 187761.4Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
3 Apr 188367.0AppointedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
2 Apr 189579.0DiedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pieter Mathijs Snickers:
Archbishop Pieter Mathijs Snickers (born , died ) Archbishop of Utrecht

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 299, and Page 575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013