Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonsus M. Henricus Joosten, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Marciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1837Born
10 Aug 186325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Oct 188749.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
4 Oct 188749.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
8 Dec 188750.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
18 Dec 189659.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus M. Henricus Joosten (VIAF: 283648126)
Bishop Alphonsus M. Henricus Joosten O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNijmegen, Netherlands
Ordained BishopCathedral, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht, Netherlands

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast