Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrianus Godschalk

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1819Born
8 Oct 184526.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 187758.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
17 Aug 187758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
14 Oct 187758.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
8 Jan 187858.4AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
4 Jan 189272.4DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Adrianus Godschalk (VIAF: 288215764)
Bishop Adrianus Godschalk (born , died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDungen
Ordained BishopSeminary, Haarlem, Diocese of Haarlem

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 165, and Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017