Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Leyten

Deceased

Bishop of Breda, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1834Born
13 Feb 185924.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 188550.8AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
29 Jun 188550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Breda, Netherlands
17 May 191479.8DiedBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Petrus Leyten (VIAF: 280642814)
Bishop Petrus Leyten (born , died ) Bishop of Breda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGinneken, Diocese of Breda
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breda, Diocese of Breda

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017