Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinus Josephus Callier

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1849BornVlissingen
15 Aug 187223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Haarlem, Netherlands
11 Sep 190354.3AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
28 Oct 190354.4Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
23 Apr 192878.9DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Josephus Callier:
Bishop Augustinus Josephus Callier (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013