Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurentius Josephus Antonius Hubertus Schrijnen (Schrynen)

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1861BornVenlo
21 Mar 188523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
28 Mar 191452.6AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
13 May 191452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
26 Mar 193270.6DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Laurentius Josephus Antonius Hubertus Schrijnen (Schrynen):
Bishop Laurentius Josephus Antonius Hubertus Schrijnen (Schrynen) (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015