Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Dermot O’Flanagan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Juneau, Alaska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1901BornLahinch, Ireland
27 Aug 192928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Alaska, USA
9 Jul 195150.3AppointedBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
3 Oct 195150.6Ordained BishopBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
19 Jun 196867.3ResignedBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
19 Jun 196867.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trecalae
13 Jan 197169.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Trecalae
31 Dec 197271.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Juneau, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Dermot O’Flanagan:
Bishop Robert Dermot O’Flanagan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Juneau

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013