Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Daniel Howard

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA

Titular Archbishop of Albulae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1877Born
12 Jun 190628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
23 Dec 192346.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
23 Dec 192346.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Isaura
8 Apr 192446.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isaura
30 Apr 192648.4AppointedArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
26 Aug 192648.8InstalledArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
9 Dec 196689.0RetiredArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
9 Dec 196689.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Albulae
2 Jan 1983105.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Daniel Howard
Archbishop Edward Daniel Howard (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCresco, IA
Death PlaceBeaverton, OR
Buried Place (Original)Mount Calvary, Cemetery, Portland, OR, Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon

  • a priest for 76.5 years
  • a bishop for 58.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,924, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast