Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas William Drumm

Deceased

Bishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1871Born
21 Dec 190130.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
28 Mar 191947.7AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
21 May 191947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
23 May 191947.8InstalledBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
24 Oct 193362.2DiedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas William Drumm
Bishop Thomas William Drumm (born , died ) Bishop of Des Moines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFore, County Westmeath, Ireland
Ordained PriestMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada
Ordained BishopSt. Raphael, Cathedral, Dubuque, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Death PlaceDes Moines, Diocese of Des Moines, Iowa
Buried Place (Original)Glendale, Cemetery, Des Moines, Diocese of Des Moines, Iowa

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast