Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Rosati, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri

Apostolic Delegate to Haiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1789BornSora, Italy
1 Apr 180819.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
10 Feb 181122.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Feb 182233.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
13 Aug 182233.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mississippi and Alabama, USA
14 Jul 182334.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
25 Mar 182435.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
18 Jul 182637.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
18 Jul 182637.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
20 Mar 182738.1AppointedBishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
4 Aug 182940.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
30 Apr 184152.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
25 Sep 184354.7DiedBishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Rosati (VIAF: 74779410)
Bishop Joseph Rosati C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Louis

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 245, and Page 286
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016