Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Blanc

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1792Born
22 Jul 181623.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 183542.6AppointedBishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
22 Nov 183543.1Ordained BishopBishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
19 Jul 185057.7AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
20 Jun 186067.6DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Blanc (VIAF: 29528063)
Archbishop Anthony Blanc (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSury-le-Comtal, France

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 287
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017