Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Jean-Mathias Loras

Deceased

Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1792Born
12 Nov 181523.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 183744.9AppointedBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
10 Dec 183745.2Ordained BishopBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
19 Apr 183946.6InstalledBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
19 Feb 185865.4DiedBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jean-Mathias Loras (VIAF: 58811002)
Bishop Pierre-Jean-Mathias Loras (born , died ) Bishop of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyons, France

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018