Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Portier

Deceased

Bishop of Mobile, Alabama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1795BornMontbrison, France
16 May 181822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
26 Aug 182530.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alabama and the Floridas, USA
26 Aug 182530.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
5 Nov 182631.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
15 May 182933.7AppointedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
14 May 185963.7DiedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Portier:
Bishop Michael Portier (born , died ) Bishop of Mobile

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 267, and Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013