Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Barry

Deceased

Bishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1799Born
24 Sep 182526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
9 Jan 185757.4AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
2 Aug 185758.0Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
19 Nov 185960.3DiedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Barry
Bishop John Barry (born , died ) Bishop of Savannah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoolamain, Diocese of Ferns, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017