Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John England

Deceased

Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1786BornCork, Ireland
11 Oct 180822.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
11 Aug 182033.9AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
21 Sep 182034.0Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
31 Dec 182034.3InstalledBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
11 Apr 184255.6DiedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for John England:
Bishop John England (born , died ) Bishop of Charleston

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013