Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Moylan

Deceased

Bishop of Cork, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1735Born
11 Jun 176125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
8 May 177539.6AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
19 Jun 178751.7AppointedBishop of Cork, Ireland
10 Feb 1815³79.3DiedBishop of Cork, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Moylan (VIAF: 2342122)
Bishop Francis Moylan (born , died ) Bishop of Cork

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDouglas
Death PlaceCork, Diocese of Cork

  • a priest for 53.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182, and Page 97
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 63
  • op: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • d.loc: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • op/d.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast