Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Teahan (Teaghan)

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1746BornCork
19 Jun 178741.5AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Jul 1787²41.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
4 Dec 179145.9AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
20 Mar 179246.2ResignedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
4 Jul 179751.5DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Gerard Teahan (Teaghan):
Bishop Gerard Teahan (Teaghan) (died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a bishop for 10.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013