Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Egan

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1726³BornWaterford
1750¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 177145.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
8 Mar 177145.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
19 May 177347.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
12 Feb 177549.0SucceededBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
22 Jul 179670.5DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Egan:
Bishop William Egan (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 389, and Page 446
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 16 May 2015