Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Bray

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1749Born
22 May 177425.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 179243.3AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
14 Oct 179243.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
15 Dec 182071.7DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bray
Archbishop Thomas Bray (born , died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Thurles

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast