Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Young

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1746³Born
23 Sep 176923.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Limerick, Ireland
9 Jun 177024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
4 Jan 179346.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limerick, Ireland
4 Jan 179346.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
20 May 179347.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
19 Jun 179650.2SucceededBishop of Limerick, Ireland
22 Sep 181367.5DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Young
Bishop John Young (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Chapel, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick
Buried Place (Original)Old graveyard, St. Patrick's, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 282, and Page 262
  • b/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 21
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast