Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Sughrue

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1761Born
9 Feb 179836.9AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
11 Jun 179837.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
29 Sep 182463.5DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Charles Sughrue
Bishop Charles Sughrue (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerry

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,698
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018