Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Everard

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1751¹Born
May 1784³33.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 181463.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
4 Oct 181463.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
23 Apr 181564.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
15 Dec 182069.9SucceededArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
31 Mar 182170.2DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Everard
Archbishop Patrick Everard (born 1751, died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFethard, Co. Tipperary
Ordained PriestSan Ildefonso
Ordained BishopCork, Diocese of Cork
Buried Place (Original)St. John the Baptist, Church, Cashel, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138, and Page 267
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 42, and Page 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Aug 2020

Quantcast