Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Dillon

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1739¹Born
14 Jan 179455.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
14 Jan 179455.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
18 May 179455.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
29 Jun 179556.4SucceededBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
29 Jun 179556.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kilfenora, Ireland
19 Nov 179859.8AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
30 Aug 180970.6DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Dillon
Archbishop Edward Dillon (born 1739, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarna, near Ballinasloe, Co. Galway
Death PlaceAbbeyland, Co. Cork

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 420
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 7
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 20 Aug 2020

Quantcast