Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boetius Egan

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1740¹Born
19 Mar 176323.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 178545.8AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
1786²46.0Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
4 Jan 178848.0AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
1 Jul 179858.5DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boetius Egan
Archbishop Boetius Egan (born 1740, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunblaney, Archdiocese of Tuam
Ordained BishopTuam, Archdiocese of Tuam
Death PlaceDunblaney, Archdiocese of Tuam

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,191
  • op/ab/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63, and Page 420
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 37
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 10 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Mar 2019

Quantcast