Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Tuohy

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1754²Born
178026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
4 Oct 181460.7AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
23 Apr 181561.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
17 Mar 182874.2DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Tuohy
Bishop Charles Tuohy (born 1754, died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Cork, Diocese of Cork
Death PlaceHis residence, Newtown Villa
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick's, Church

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 239
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 126
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast