Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Laffan

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1765²Born
1794²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 182358.2AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
6 Jul 182358.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
3 Jul 183368.5DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Laffan
Archbishop Robert Laffan (born 1765, died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCashel
Ordained BishopCathedral, Thurles
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,062
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1823, Number 24
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 59
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast