Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick MacMahon (McMahon)

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1760²Born
1782²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 181959.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
27 Aug 181959.6AppointedTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
18 Nov 181959.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
5 Aug 182969.5SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
7 Jun 183676.4DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick MacMahon (McMahon)
Bishop Patrick MacMahon (McMahon) (born 1760, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpancelhill, Co. Clare
Ordained PriestBirr
Ordained BishopEnnis
Buried Place (Original)Quin Friary, Ennis

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194, and Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1819, Number 64
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast