Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Cork, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1772Born
14 Jun 179422.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 May 179522.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 181542.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cork, Ireland
21 Feb 181542.7SucceededBishop of Cork, Ireland
21 Feb 181542.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
23 Apr 181542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cork, Ireland
1 Apr 184774.8DiedBishop of Cork, Ireland

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for John Murphy (VIAF: 300325349)
Bishop John Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Cork

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShandon
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Cork, Diocese of Cork
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Cathedral, Cork, Diocese of Cork

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 163, and Page 224
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 87
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,993
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast