Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel O’Connor, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Madras

Titular Bishop of Saldae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1786BornIreland
1810¹23.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
25 Apr 183447.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India
25 Apr 183447.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
3 Aug 183448.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saldae
4 Apr 184053.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India
10 Jul 186781.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Madras, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel O’Connor:
Bishop Daniel O’Connor O.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Madras

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 329
  • c34: CB, 31 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,722
  • tdio: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd: CB, 17 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014