Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

Archidioecesis Madraspolitanus et Meliaporensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • George Antonysamy, Archbishop
  • Malayappan Chinnappa, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 13 November 1952
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 3,160 (1,220 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.madras-mylapore.org/
  • Mailing Address: 21 San Thome High Road, Chennai-600004, India
  • Telephone: (044)494.11.02; 494.08.33
  • Fax: 494.19.99

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Saint George
1642ErectedDiocese of São Tomé of Meliapore Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Saint George (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Madras
1832Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Fort Saint George Vicariate Apostolic of Madras
1851Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Madras Vicariate Apostolic of Hyderabad (erected)
Archdiocese of Madras
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Madras Archdiocese of Madras
15 June 1928Territory LostDiocese of Hyderabad
Archdiocese of Madras
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bellary (erected)
3 July 1928Territory LostArchdiocese of Madras Diocese of Nellore (erected)
13 November 1952Territory LostArchdiocese of Madras Diocese of Vellore (erected)
Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)
13 November 1952UnitedArchdiocese of Madras
Diocese of São Tomé of Meliapore
Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)
19 July 2002Territory LostArchdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor) Diocese of Chinglepet (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Madras
195070,0404,000,0001.8%38661046737624841ap1951
Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)
1970153,2894,050,0003.8%1078519279817890866ap1971
1980245,7455,904,9524.2%1291132421,0152431,278105ap1981
1990328,1437,780,0004.2%1371663031,0824441,452117ap1991
1999480,0008,500,0005.6%1572343911,2275012,030133ap2000
2000400,0008,750,0004.6%1652323971,0075062,155135ap2001
2001500,0009,000,0005.6%1772434201,1905482,165150ap2002
2002350,0006,894,8715.1%982103081,1364721,42083ap2003
2003341,3146,894,8715.0%1283084367825362,16995ap2004
2004343,1036,984,6144.9%1333194527595532,23099ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014