Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Arthur Carvalho

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

Titular Bishop of Demetrias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1886Born
11 Mar 191124.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 195266.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
13 Dec 195266.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Demetrias
19 Mar 195366.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Demetrias
196578.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
2 Aug 197992.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for Francis Arthur Carvalho
Bishop Francis Arthur Carvalho (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillenour

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018