Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bangalore

Archidioecesis Bangalorensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernard Blasius Moras, Archbishop
  • Alphonsus Mathias, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Ignatius Paul Pinto, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 September 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 29,950 (11,568 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bangalorearchdiocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.B. 2, 75 Millers Road, Bangalore-560046, India
  • Telephone: (080)2333.04.38; 2333.08.38
  • Fax: 2353.16.00

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bangalore
13 February 1940ErectedDiocese of Mysore Diocese of Bangalore (erected)
Archdiocese of Bangalore
19 September 1953ElevatedDiocese of Bangalore Archdiocese of Bangalore
14 November 1988Territory LostArchdiocese of Bangalore
Diocese of Chikmagalur
Diocese of Shimoga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bangalore
195076,7164,700,0001.6%6625918433643228ap1951
Archdiocese of Bangalore
195995,0276,200,0001.5%7810518351915957637ap1960
1970133,8276,257,6702.1%1031582615126411,04246ap1971
1980193,0438,596,0002.2%9419629066555671,62556ap1981
1988262,35013,446,5002.0%942783727059314,16678ap1991
1999278,32319,437,7731.4%984395375181,4334,16589ap2000
2000332,12019,437,7731.7%1004725725801,4414,18995ap2001
2001347,25019,437,7731.8%974895865921,4464,21598ap2002
2002358,39019,437,7731.8%1004705706281,7904,160104ap2003
2003361,83520,186,4501.8%945025966071,7944,217115ap2004
2004365,10020,192,8401.8%975116086001,7374,238117ap2005
2006406,18227,557,0001.5%1021,5301,6322484,1306,570128ap2007
2012425,00029,890,0001.4%1241,3101,43429614,0347,130135ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jun 2014