Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Duraisamy Simon Cardinal Lourdusamy

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria delle Grazie alle Fornaci fuori Porta Cavalleggeri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1924BornKalleri
21 Dec 195127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pondicherry, India
2 Jul 196238.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bangalore, India
2 Jul 196238.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Libya
22 Aug 196238.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Libya
9 Nov 196440.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bangalore, India
9 Nov 196440.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
11 Jan 196843.9SucceededArchbishop of Bangalore, India
5 Mar 197147.1AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
30 Apr 197147.2ResignedArchbishop of Bangalore, India
26 Feb 197349.1AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
19 Dec 197551.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
25 May 198561.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198561.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria delle Grazie alle Fornaci fuori Porta Cavalleggeri
30 Oct 198561.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
24 May 199167.3ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
29 Jan 199672.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria delle Grazie alle Fornaci fuori Porta Cavalleggeri
2 Jun 201490.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary for Duraisamy Simon Lourdusamy:
Duraisamy Simon Cardinal Lourdusamy (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Oriental Churches

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.8 years
  • a cardinal for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 124
  • d: CB, 1 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014