Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romeo Panciroli, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Iran

Titular Archbishop of Noba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1923Born
7 Oct 194319.8First VowsMember of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
24 Sep 194824.8Solemn VowsMember of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
11 Jun 194925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
25 Sep 197349.8AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for Social Communications
6 Nov 198460.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Noba
6 Nov 198460.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gambia
6 Nov 198460.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Liberia
6 Nov 198460.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guinea
6 Nov 198460.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Sierra Leone
16 Dec 198461.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Noba
1 Aug 198763.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Guinea
18 Mar 199268.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iran
1 Feb 199470.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iran
Apr 199975.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Iran
16 Mar 200682.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Iran

MicroData Summary for Romeo Panciroli (VIAF: 15004332)
Archbishop Romeo Panciroli M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Iran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCodemondo, Diocese of Reggio Emilia, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia, Italy
Death PlacePoliclinico Gemelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Polo d'Enza, Cemetery, Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ab/sect/x923: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 521
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • b/loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast