Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Missionarii Comboniani Cordis Iesu



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • United: 22 June 1979
  • Clerical Religious Congregation
  • Official Web Site: http://www.comboni.org/
  • Mailing Address: Via Luigi Lilio 80, 00142 Roma, Italia
  • Telephone: 06.51.94.51
  • Fax: 06.51.94.52.75

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
1 June 1867FoundedSons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
15 February 1910ApprobationSons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
22 June 1979UnitedSons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
19541,005ap1955
19591,340ap1960
19631,640ap1964
19668891,703219ap1967
19679591,740248ap1968
19711,0591,724289ap1972
19741,0991,569336ap1975
19761,1161,653349ap1977
19771,1281,643337ap1978
Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
19811,2841,835390ap1982
19861,3001,891397ap1987
19901,3111,907ap1991
19911,3161,939371ap1992
19951,3081,961352ap1996
20001,3112,239ap2001
20011,3122,218ap2002
20021,3162,250309ap2003
20041,3182,225350ap2005
20091,2961,803328ap2010
20101,2721,768323ap2011
20111,2611,729322ap2012
20121,2531,732312ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014