Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Zambonardi, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Prefect of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1884Born
8 Aug 190925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
1 Feb 192843.9AppointedPrefect of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan
193853.8DiedPrefect of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Zambonardi
Father Giuseppe Zambonardi F.S.C.J. (born , died 1938) Prefect of Bahr el-Gebel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGardone, Italy

  • a priest for 28.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018