Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Bartolucci Panaroni, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas

Titular Bishop of Castulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1928BornMercatello sul Metauro, Italy
7 Jun 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
14 Jun 197345.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador
14 Jun 197345.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castulo
29 Jun 197345.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castulo
10 Feb 199566.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Enrico Bartolucci Panaroni:
Bishop Enrico Bartolucci Panaroni M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013