Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olindo Natale Spagnolo Martellozzo, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Cissi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1925Born
29 Mar 195226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
2 Feb 199064.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
2 Feb 199064.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissi
3 Mar 199064.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissi
3 Mar 200175.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
23 Jul 200882.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Olindo Natale Spagnolo Martellozzo
Bishop Olindo Natale Spagnolo Martellozzo M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Giustina in Colle, Italy

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,858
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,586
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018