Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Guayaquil

Archidioecesis Guayaquilensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 January 1956
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 18,711 (7,227 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiacatolicaguayaquil.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 09-01-254, Calle Clemente Ballen 501 y Chimborazo, Guayaquil, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (04)2322.778; 2328.872
  • Fax: 2329.695

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Guayaquil
29 January 1838ErectedDiocese of Quito Diocese of Guayaquil (erected)
23 March 1870Territory LostDiocese of Guayaquil
Archdiocese of Quito
Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio) (erected)
15 July 1948Territory LostDiocese of Guayaquil Vicariate Apostolic of Los Ríos (erected)
6 May 1950Territory LostDiocese of Guayaquil Prefecture Apostolic of Galápagos (erected)
26 July 1954Territory LostDiocese of Guayaquil
Diocese of Loja
Territorial Prelature of El Oro (erected)
Archdiocese of Guayaquil
22 January 1956ElevatedDiocese of Guayaquil Archdiocese of Guayaquil
4 November 2009Territory LostArchdiocese of Guayaquil Diocese of San Jacinto de Yaguachi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Guayaquil
1950792,320898,57888.2%4345889,0039413858ap1951
Archdiocese of Guayaquil
19661,025,0001,052,00097.4%551301855,5404351069ap1967
19681,291,895.0%66141207023047459ap1971
19761,300,0001,600,00081.3%711422136,103117257177ap1977
19801,699,1651,810,00093.9%961292257,55116859296ap1981
19902,607,0002,800,00093.1%12511323810,95317268541181ap1991
19993,200,0003,500,00091.4%1368221814,67821106487191ap2000
20003,260,0003,600,00090.6%1908527511,85423103494191ap2001
20013,400,0003,600,00094.4%1508223214,6552799496192ap2002
20023,400,0003,600,00094.4%1578524214,04924104502192ap2003
20033,400,0003,600,00094.4%1639025313,43826111509193ap2004
20043,000,0003,400,00088.2%1754221713,8242565411203ap2005
20063,022,0003,357,00090.0%2071323398,91425155523221ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Aug 2014